Financial history DRAGON BANDS

Charity number: 1107406
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £103.54k £37.02k £20.04k £24.35k £18.00k
Total expenditure £72.50k £57.66k £16.15k £28.14k £30.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A