Accounts and annual returns BARLEY FIELDS CHILDCARE

Charity number: 1107508
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2010 03 March 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2009 28 April 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2008 24 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 24 September 2008 On Time