Financial history BARLEY FIELDS CHILDCARE

Charity Number: 1107508
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2006 31/07/2007 31/07/2008 31/07/2009 31/07/2010
Total gross income £16.50k £23.67k £14.13k £15.36k £15.10k
Total expenditure £14.69k £22.40k £15.73k £13.62k £16.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A