Financial history WICKED FISH THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1108661
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £54.25k £22.76k £22.39k £74.56k £8.68k
Total expenditure £62.83k £25.62k £21.53k £58.60k £23.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A