Accounts and annual returns THE WELL AT WILLEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1110183
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 23 February 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 07 February 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2015 14 April 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2014 21 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 Not Required