Financial history THE WELL AT WILLEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1110183
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2013 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017
Total gross income £1.87k £5.55k £1.92k £1.19k £365
Total expenditure £4.40k £4.05k £10.10k £5.48k £65
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A