Financial history MULTI-SPORT CLUB

Charity number: 1109962
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.68k £5.68k £6.33k £12.62k £11.58k
Total expenditure £15.78k £3.58k £9.62k £13.59k £11.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A