Governing document MULTI-SPORT CLUB
Charity number: 1109962

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 15TH JULY 2004 AS AMENDED 1ST SEPTEMBER 2004, 12TH MAY 2005 AND 4 FEBRUARY 2010 as amended on 03 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
To promote for the benefit of the public and further community participation in healthy recreation in the Hampshire area by organising or providing coaching and training to enable, assist and encourage people aged 16+ with learning and/or physical disabilities to play team games, sports, dance and social activities.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
HAMPSHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.