Accounts and annual returns STOKE ON TRENT DOLPHINS GATEWAY CLUB

Charity Number: 1108145
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2009 05 March 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2008 13 May 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2007 17 April 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2007 Not Required