Financial history STOKE ON TRENT DOLPHINS GATEWAY CLUB

Charity number: 1108145
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2005 31/10/2006 31/10/2007 31/10/2008 31/10/2009
Total gross income £2.27k £903 £617 £858 £679
Total expenditure £1.98k £1.39k £1.24k £2.13k £956
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A