Financial history SAMARITAN TRUST FOR THE POOR AND NEEDY

Charity number: 1109741
Charity reporting is overdue by 307 days

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/08/2018 30/08/2019 30/08/2020 30/08/2021 30/08/2022
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A