Accounts and annual returns JACARI

Charity number: 1108827
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 02 March 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2016 25 April 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 25 April 2017 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2015 30 March 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 30 March 2016 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2014 06 February 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014 06 February 2015 On Time