Accounts and annual returns THE GARDAWORLD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1109091
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2018 26 April 2019 147 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 29 August 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 30 September 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required