Financial history THE GARDAWORLD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1109091
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/01/2017 31/01/2018
Total gross income £4.84k £2.38k £2.73k £10.15k £940
Total expenditure £8.54k £22.06k £110 £37.25k £806
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A