Financial history WHITEPARISH ALL SAINTS PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1109517
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £7.69k £10.84k £4.31k £8.00k £16.26k
Total expenditure £17.16k £9.16k £4.44k £2.16k £11.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A