Financial history SHARING VOICES (BRADFORD)

Charity number: 1112686
Charity reporting is up to date (87 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £476.66k £745.55k £220.21k £337.91k £316.44k
Total expenditure £382.50k £482.71k £669.32k £460.98k £213.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £476.10k £745.55k £220.21k £334.58k £285.67k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £745.55k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £448.51k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £34.20k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £17.81k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A