Accounts and annual returns GAP MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1111373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 February 2021 2 days late Download Open in new window