Accounts and annual returns LEIGH PARK INITIATIVE

Charity Number: 1112936
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2013 26 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2012 17 April 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2011 26 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2010 19 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 Not Required