Financial history LEIGH PARK INITIATIVE

Charity Number: 1112936
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2009 30/09/2010 30/09/2011 30/09/2012 30/09/2013
Total gross income £8.82k £2.12k £1.55k £152 £900
Total expenditure £7.80k £1.43k £499 £350 £900
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A