Financial history EDUCATING KENYAN ORPHANS

Charity number: 1116972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 12/12/2019 12/12/2020 12/12/2021 12/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.50k £773 £1.20k £0 £1.50k
Total expenditure £3.62k £1.31k £380 £0 £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A