Trustees EDUCATING KENYAN ORPHANS

Charity number: 1116972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carolyn Leach Chair 29 August 2024
None on record
Jocasta Fay Trustee 13 August 2024
None on record
Nelson Orero Oenga Trustee 01 June 2024
None on record
Alexander Cross Trustee 20 September 2023
None on record
Deirdre Elizabeth Luftus Trustee 20 September 2023
None on record
Melanie Moulding Trustee 24 November 2006
None on record
Grace Fay Trustee 24 November 2006
None on record
Ruth Mallon Trustee 11 November 2006
None on record
ALAN MOULDING Trustee
None on record