Trustees ASIAN ELDERS' RESOURCE CENTRE

Charity Number: 1114101
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Chan Parmar Chair 24 October 2014
None on record
Derek Jhon Bullock Trustee 15 January 2025
None on record
Harnovdeep Singh Bharaj Trustee 17 February 2022
None on record
Narendra Solanki Trustee 12 January 2021
None on record
Rehana Makkan Trustee 12 January 2021
None on record
INDIRABEN TAILOR Trustee 11 June 2020
None on record
Prabhodchandra Patel Trustee 28 November 2019
None on record
Yusuf Mangera Trustee 23 November 2017
None on record