Financial history BBG - BUILDING FUTURES

Charity number: 1115062
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £5.78k £6.18k £6.28k £28 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £6.25k £0 £28
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A