Financial history NEATH PORT TALBOT CHILD CONTACT CENTRE

Charity number: 1114023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £5.25k £8.25k £6.72k £9.08k £5.50k
Total expenditure £7.35k £7.03k £5.14k £5.98k £8.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A