Accounts and annual returns WALSALL MULTI FAITH FORUM

Charity Number: 1117669
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 March 2017 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 04 June 2016 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required