Financial history WALSALL MULTI FAITH FORUM

Charity Number: 1117669
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £0 £0 £4.00k £100 £2.50k
Total expenditure £80 £502 £4.00k £0 £110
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A