Accounts and annual returns ISMAIL SHARIF AND FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1113651
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 February 2025 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 September 2022 227 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 September 2022 227 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required