Accounts and annual returns ABU KIWANUKA MEMORIAL CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1115233
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2012 06 April 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 24 November 2012 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required