Financial history ABU KIWANUKA MEMORIAL CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1115233
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2011 31/12/2012
Total gross income £4.26k £1.97k £1.40k £0 £0
Total expenditure £16.10k £2.39k £0 £3.00k £3.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A