Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST PETER AD VINCULA COMBE MARTIN

Charity number: 1114264
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required