Financial history FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST PETER AD VINCULA COMBE MARTIN

Charity number: 1114264
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.11k £4.19k £1.61k £2.13k £167
Total expenditure £800 £2.08k £2.65k £626 £246
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A