Accounts and annual returns ST MICHAEL'S CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1114511
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 19 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 22 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 25 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 21 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 03 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required