Financial history ST MICHAEL'S CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1114511
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £4.22k £1.98k £750 £2.87k £3.76k
Total expenditure £3.88k £608 £3.01k £3.14k £3.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A