Accounts and annual returns PURITON HORSE RESCUE

Charity number: 1114875
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 March 2019 16 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 29 March 2018 07 July 2019 159 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 29 March 2017 29 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 29 March 2016 29 March 2017 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 March 2016 Not Required