Accounts and annual returns THE INSPIRATION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1115014
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2015 26 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2014 11 September 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2013 06 December 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2012 10 June 2013 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 10 June 2013 10 days late