Financial history THE INSPIRATION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1115014
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2011 31/07/2012 31/07/2013 31/07/2014 31/07/2015
Total gross income £113.51k £62.76k £0 £3.04k £5.15k
Total expenditure £107.37k £55.32k £10.59k £121 £11.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A