Financial history GREAT WILBRAHAM PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1116632
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/11/2019 01/11/2020 01/11/2021 01/11/2022 01/11/2023
Total gross income £13.58k £3.66k £14.85k £9.21k £17.88k
Total expenditure £9.83k £5.41k £8.53k £15.46k £16.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A