Accounts and annual returns BASQUE CHILDREN OF '37 ASSOCIATION UK

Charity number: 1115920
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 December 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2016 05 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2015 09 May 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2014 07 August 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2014 Not Required