Financial history BASQUE CHILDREN OF '37 ASSOCIATION UK

Charity number: 1115920
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2012 30/11/2013 30/11/2014 30/11/2015 30/11/2016
Total gross income £25.32k £1.55k £977 £1.16k £1.82k
Total expenditure £27.69k £3.65k £1.89k £2.67k £1.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A