Financial history HARLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1115777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.00k £22.55k £15.50k £8.66k £5.63k
Total expenditure £6.89k £6.19k £14.66k £6.92k £10.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.93k £10.67k N/A N/A