Financial history CARE AND COMFORT COMMUNITY SERVICES

Charity number: 1117127
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £175.00k £220.00k £241.00k £241.00k £225.00k
Total expenditure £240.00k £214.00k £240.00k £240.00k £214.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £43.00k £30.35k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £13.50k