Accounts and annual returns EAGLES MOUNT ADVENTURES U.K.

Charity number: 1121668
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 March 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 August 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 01 August 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required