Financial history EAGLES MOUNT ADVENTURES U.K.

Charity number: 1121668
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £24.21k £9.24k £19.06k £30.18k £12.76k
Total expenditure £27.26k £8.50k £13.04k £16.66k £32.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A