Accounts and annual returns WEST MELTON PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1116765
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 07 January 2022 19 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 07 January 2021 27 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 07 January 2020 18 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 07 January 2019 05 August 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 January 2019 Not Required