Financial history WEST MELTON PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1116765
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 07/01/2018 07/01/2019 07/01/2020 07/01/2021 07/01/2022
Total gross income £635 £8.42k £8.54k £0 £0
Total expenditure £737 £3.67k £1.81k £600 £2.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A