Accounts and annual returns STEVENAGE CVS

Charity Number: 1116990
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2013 17 December 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 18 November 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 02 August 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 11 July 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 21 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 08 July 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 02 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 05 July 2010 On Time