Financial history STEVENAGE CVS

Charity Number: 1116990
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 30/09/2013
Total gross income £197.80k £197.95k £185.52k £115.49k £144.44k
Total expenditure £182.09k £189.34k £196.00k £119.75k £211.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A