Financial history SLOUGH ISLAMIC SCHOOL PROJECT

Charity Number: 1119531
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £11.88k £43.76k £32.21k £29.47k £24.60k
Total expenditure £109.92k £107.71k £105.53k £102.89k £111.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A