Financial history SANTON BRIDGE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1117609
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 21/04/2020 21/04/2021 21/04/2022 21/04/2023 21/04/2024
Total gross income £17.53k £14.86k £16.92k £801 £44
Total expenditure £36.10k £13.75k £7.72k £34.03k £2.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £10.64k £10.67k N/A N/A