Financial history CLWYD SPECIAL RIDING CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1118241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £349.93k £272.12k £205.53k £302.23k £363.46k
Total expenditure £368.72k £284.69k £220.01k £314.68k £386.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £94.77k £78.90k £9.00k £1.50k